Hassani, Behzad (CPSO#: 91485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
(Adult) Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

St Joseph Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Hassani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hassani ( CPSO# 91485 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
Emergency Department
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Adult Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Good Doctors Medical Inc.
1984 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S1
Phone Number: (705) 805-0199

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHZAD HASSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013