Hassouneh, Basil (CPSO#: 88222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eye Face Institute
Suite 316
4789 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Phone: 1 888 883 7503
Fax: (647) 797 0224
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. Sulaiman Al Habib Hospital
Building No. 55
Dubai Healthcare city
Dubai P.O. Box 505
United Arab Emirates
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 971-4-429-7777
County: 
Electoral District: 

Otolaryngology Clinic
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Canada
Phone: 905-662-3417
Fax: 905-592-2325
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASIL HASSOUNEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSOUNEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012