Hategan, Ana (CPSO#: 78695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care Hamilton
West 5th Campus
Geriatrics Room H101
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36782
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Healthy Aging
Hamilton Health Sciences
St. Peter's Hospital Site
88 Maplewood Ave
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 549-6525
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANA HATEGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATEGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Dec 2002 to 02 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 03 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008