Hau, Monica Maurn-Yie (CPSO#: 84282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Public Health
7120 Hurontario Street
RPO Streetsville
P O Box 630
Mississauga ON  L5M 2C1
Phone: (905) 791-7800
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA MAURN-YIE HAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008