Hauspy, Jan Jozef Peter (CPSO#: 82039)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French, German, Spanish

Education:Antwerpen University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 23 Jan 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jan 2010