Haussmann, Jessica Amber (CPSO#: 77739)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 02 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2005 to 26 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008