Haverstock, John Patrick (CPSO#: 90749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical Centre
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 310
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: 289-813-2004
Fax: 289-813-0354
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Forward Haverstock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Haverstock ( CPSO# 90749 )
Dr. K. Forward ( CPSO# 87026 )

Business Address:
MUMC Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Suite 2N491
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
North Oakville Medical
310 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 813-2004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PATRICK HAVERSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAVERSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2014