Havey, Thomas Ciaran (CPSO#: 90791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
C/O Medical Staff Office
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Havey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Havey ( CPSO# 90791 )
Dr. S. Moore ( CPSO# 105389)

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
Suite D304
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS CIARAN HAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2014 to 30 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015