Hawes, Robert Holbrook (CPSO#: 67395)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Indiana University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2018