Hawisa, Nura Ibrahim Sheibani (CPSO#: 78991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73687
Fax: (905) 522-7982
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

unit 103-170 Rockhaven lane
Hamilton ON  L8B 1B5
Canada
Phone: 9056899499
Fax: 9056895284
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Dyub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hawisa ( CPSO# 78991 )
Dr. A. Dyub ( CPSO# 77121 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing, Suite 504
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NURA IBRAHIM SHEIBANI HAWISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWISA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2003 to 26 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 27 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 15 Nov 2009 to 14 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011