Hawley, Kristopher Stephen (CPSO#: 72302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
McMaster University Health
Science Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-4941
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Urgent Care Centre
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristopher Hawley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hawley ( CPSO# 72302 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Urgent Care Centre
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTOPHER STEPHEN HAWLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004