Hayashida, Peter John Kaye (CPSO#: 51378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hayashida Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 504 95 Bayly Street West Ajax ON L1S 7K8 (905) 426-2815
Instructions: Patients looking to request their medical records can contact Dr. Vishal Sharma
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN KAYE HAYASHIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYASHIDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1988