Hayat, Yasser Muhammad (CPSO#: 90583)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 20 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 20 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 16 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015