Haykal, Siba (CPSO#: 86255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room 8N-869
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siba Haykal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Haykal ( CPSO# 86255 )

Business Address:
8N -869 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4327

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIBA HAYKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2017