Hayman, Christopher Ronald (CPSO#: 78193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trenton Memorial Hospital -
Quinte Health Care
242 King St
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2541 Ext. 5466
Fax: (613) 961-5503
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care
North Hastings Hospital
1­H Manor Lane, P.O. Box 157
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2825
Fax: (613) 332-3847
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Quinte Health Care
Prince Edward County Memorial Hosp
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-1008
Fax: (613) 476-8600
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Hayman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hayman ( CPSO# 78193 )

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
1 Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare Corporation
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER RONALD HAYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

NOTE: The decision in this matter has been confirmed by the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)