Haynen, Bennett Kenji Maruno (CPSO#: 96612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone: 905-935-4763
Fax: 905-646-3251
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health
St. Catharines General Hospital
Divison of Cardiology
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bennett Haynen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Haynen ( CPSO# 96612 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Cardiology
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7N6
Phone Number: (905) 935-4763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENNETT KENJI MARUNO HAYNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYNEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 24 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Nov 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013