Hayward, Lauren Anne (CPSO#: 95251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Lessard, Lauren Anne (used until: 13 Mar 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Perth FHT
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren A. Hayward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hayward ( CPSO# 95251 )

Business Address:
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2N1
Phone Number: (519) 291-6265

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN ANNE HAYWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013