Hazlewood, Glen Stewart (CPSO#: 94447)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2012