Hazrati, Ali (CPSO#: 83925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: 4164868088
Fax: 4164867888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Hospital - Birchmount
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Hazrati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hazrati ( CPSO# 83925 )

Business Address:
Greenestone Clinic
Suite 300
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 14 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI HAZRATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAZRATI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.


Update: As of June 4, 2018, Dr. Hazrati has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)