Hazrati, Lili-Naz (CPSO#: 78213)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pathology
3rd floor- Black wing
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 8131500 Ext. 203144
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILI-NAZ HAZRATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAZRATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2008