Healey, Jane (CPSO#: 76427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital site
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Halton Healthcare
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2471
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane & Paul Healey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Healey ( CPSO# 76427 )
Dr. P. Healey ( CPSO# 76068 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4605

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Aug 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE HEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005