Healy, Brian Daniel (CPSO#: 90584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cancer Clinic - Medical Day Unit
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-7722
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Healy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Healy ( CPSO# 90584 )

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DANIEL HEALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013