Heaton, Graham William (CPSO#: 82930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
378 Huron St.
Stratford ON  N5A 5T5
Phone: (519) 305-3550
Fax: (519) 305-3552
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

704 Mara Street. Unit 106
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Canada
Phone: 5193019427
Fax: 5193053552
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Heaton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Heaton ( CPSO# 82930 )

Business Address:
378 Huron Street
Suite B
Stratford ON  N5A 5T5
Phone Number: (519) 305-3550

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6

Business Address:
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0

Business Address:
Suite 106
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4

Business Address:
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM WILLIAM HEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEATON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011