Heaton, Jeremy Paul William (CPSO#: 33091)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart St Kingston, ON K7L 2V7
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 28 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018