Hebb, Matthew Olding (CPSO#: 84101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2981
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Hebb Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hebb ( CPSO# 84101 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-2981

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Clincial Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW OLDING HEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEBB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2009