Hecht, Nathan Graham (CPSO#: 96397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Hecht Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hecht ( CPSO# 96397 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 795-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN GRAHAM HECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HECHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016