Heeley-Ray, Timothy Robert (CPSO#: 97090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
840 McConnel Ave
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 932-4240 Ext. 2227
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ROBERT HEELEY-RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEELEY-RAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012