Heendeniya, Amila Chinthaka (CPSO#: 108192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: Heendeniya Vidanaral, Amila Chinthaka (used until: 11 Apr 2017 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
13EN - 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMILA CHINTHAKA HEENDENIYA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HEENDENIYA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HEENDENIYA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HEENDENIYA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HEENDENIYA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HEENDENIYA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HEENDENIYA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019