Heerema, Timothy James (CPSO#: 82513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanover Medical Clinic
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: (519) 364-3965
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Heerema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Heerema ( CPSO# 82513 )

Business Address:
Hanover Medical Clinic
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 23 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JAMES HEEREMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEEREMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 19 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008