Heffernan, Patrick Alan (CPSO#: 31312)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.A. Heffernan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 28 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 38 - 2130 North Park Dr Brampton, ON L6S 0C9
Date Received: 03 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018