Hegazy, Nasr Abd Elmohsen (CPSO#: 85647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400 Ext. 3554
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nasr Hegazy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hegazy ( CPSO# 85647 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASR ABD ELMOHSEN HEGAZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGAZY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 18 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010