Hegmann, Erik Joseph (CPSO#: 70394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
737 Silver Seven Road
Suites 8 & 9
Kanata ON  K2V 0H3
Phone: (613) 592-3202
Fax: (613) 592-9225
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Med-Team Clinic
Suite 103
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Fax: (613) 591-3778
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erik Hegmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hegmann ( CPSO# 70394 )

Business Address:
Suite 8 and 9
737 Silver Seven Road
Kanata ON  K2V 0H3
Phone Number: (613) 592-3202

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIK JOSEPH HEGMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998