Heiner, Maurice Mcdonald (CPSO#: 27605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wesley Medical Centre
Suite 26/27 Level 2
40 Chasely Street
Auchenflower
Brisbane 4067
Australia
Phone: 61 7 38704468
Fax: 61 7 33713677

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICE MCDONALD HEINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEINER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2018