Heisler, Benjamin Ellis (CPSO#: 72117)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 19 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 1998 to 24 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1998