Heisz, Erin Michelle (CPSO#: 82730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone: (519) 508-1212
Fax: (519) 508-1240
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Heisz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Heisz ( CPSO# 82730 )

Business Address:
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone Number: (519) 508-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Aug 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN MICHELLE HEISZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEISZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007