Hejjaji, Hana Elmehdi (CPSO#: 71820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 3941
Fax: (905) 848-7676
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 17 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Hejjaji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hejjaji ( CPSO# 71820 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANA ELMEHDI HEJJAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEJJAJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2001