Helleman, Krista Elizabeth (CPSO#: 72462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
Pediatric Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 13617
Fax: (519) 685-8347
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krista Helleman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Helleman ( CPSO# 72462 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre - Children's Hospita
Paediatric Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTA ELIZABETH HELLEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2002