Helpman Bek, Limor (CPSO#: 88283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: 9053879495 Ext. 64808
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Limor Helpman Bek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Helpman Bek ( CPSO# 88283 )

Business Address:
HHS Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 Apr 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective: 21 Apr 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 20 Jun 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 21 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Limor Helpman Bek may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Gynecologic Oncology,
                        McMaster University, in which Dr. Helpman Bek holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Helpman
                  Bek no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate is issued on April 21, 2017, and expires on June 30,
                  2020.  Upon renewal of Dr. Helpman Bek's academic appointment at McMaster
                  University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraph 2 above.