Helyer, Lucy Kathryn (CPSO#: 81631)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 2007