Henao-Florez, Oscar (CPSO#: 91828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Antioquia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4169786976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSCAR HENAO-FLOREZ shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HENAO-FLOREZ is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HENAO-FLOREZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HENAO-FLOREZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HENAO-FLOREZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HENAO-FLOREZ is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HENAO-FLOREZ no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019