Henderson, Lemay Elaine (CPSO#: 75658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
278 Front Street
Box 190
Hornepayne ON  P0M 1Z0
Phone: (807) 868-2442
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEMAY ELAINE HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002