Henderson, Tamara Amy (CPSO#: 80810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tamara Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Henderson ( CPSO# 80810 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMARA AMY HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 16 Dec 2008 to 15 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 16 Dec 2009 to 15 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010