Hendler, Aaron Lloyd (CPSO#: 54063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Eaton Wing 1ES-416
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 8562
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: A. Hendler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hendler ( CPSO# 54063 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 1-ES-416
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 6-201
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON LLOYD HENDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1985