Hendy, Ayman Mahmoud Mohamed Ibrahiem (CPSO#: 78461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Elizabeth II Health Services
Halifax Infirmary Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1796 Summer Street
Halifax NS  B3H 3A7
Phone: (902) 473-2700
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Hendy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYMAN MAHMOUD MOHAMED IBRAHIEM HENDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008