Henning, Christopher (CPSO#: 66418)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012