Henry, Bonnie Jeanne Fraser (CPSO#: 74532)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005