Henry, Paul (CPSO#: 90615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Henry ( CPSO# 90615 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7074

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL HENRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014