Henry, Sean (CPSO#: 78504)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2004