Henze Oxenius, Georg Tobias (CPSO#: 94954)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Zurich, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2011 to 17 Jun 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 2011 to 17 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2012