Hercig, Dragan (CPSO#: 65683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Owen Blvd
Toronto ON  M2P 1G7
Phone: (416) 934-0098
Fax: (416) 444-0452
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dragan Hercig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hercig ( CPSO# 65683 )

Business Address:
220 Owen Boulevard
Toronto ON  M2P 1G7
Phone Number: (416) 934-0098

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Croatia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRAGAN HERCIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERCIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1996